Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wilson, Mary, filed a(n) Other case represented by Knight, James Weldon, against Walmart Stores Inc, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2007 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
September 03, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
September 02, 2008 | Docket Event | TAKEN ON JULY 16, 2008 | |
September 02, 2008 | Docket Event | PATEL TAKEN ON JULY 16, 2008 | |
September 02, 2008 | Docket Event | TAKEN ON JULY 18, 2008 | |
September 02, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL DEPOSITION OF MIKE MEYER | |
September 02, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL DEPOSITION OF CATHY FOWLER | |
September 02, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF DEPOSITION OF VANNETA | |
September 02, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF DEPOSITION OF OLLIE BRITS | |
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.