Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case in the jurisdiction of Okaloosa County. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Superior Courts Circuit with BROWN, JOHN T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 01, 2024 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationOkaloosa County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | JUDGE BROWN, JOHN T: ASSIGNED | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2024012594 | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER TO PLAINTIFF RE REQUIRED REPORTING | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: STEPHENS, JEFFREY M SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2024 CA 000944 F, ROWE, IAN VS. WATERFIELD & ASSOCIATES INC ATTACHMENT COUNT: 4 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: SIT-4/1/2024,OPR-4/2/2024 | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO: APRIL HANER | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 04/01/2024 CASE NUMBER 2024 CA 000944 F |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.