Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Okaloosa County. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Superior Courts Circuit with KETCHEL, TERRANCE R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2023 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability - Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOkaloosa County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: CHILDS, EVIN DYESS SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2023 CA 004239 F, GUENNEWIG, VICTORIA VS. PEPITO'S MEXICAN RESTAURANT ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: SIT-12/7/2023 | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023048901 | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO: PEPITOS MEXICAN RESTAURANT | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO PLAINTIFF RE REQUIRED REPORTING | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGE KETCHEL, TERRANCE R: ASSIGNED | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO: E.G. LAND INVESTMENTS LLC | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: CHILDS, EVIN DYESS SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2023 CA 004239 F, GUENNEWIG, VICTORIA VS. PEPITO'S MEXICAN RESTAURANT ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: SIT-12/7/2023,OPR-12/7/2023 | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $417.00 RECEIPT #2023048670 | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 12/06/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 CA 004239 F | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.