Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ROUNDPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING CORPORATION vs. BIENVENU, BARRY B
A Non-Hmstd Res Forc >$250,000* case was filed in the jurisdiction of Okaloosa County. Judge STONE, WILLIAM F presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 30, 2015
Last Refreshed
May 15, 2024
Filing Location
Okaloosa County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Category
NON-HMSTD RES FORC >$250,000*
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Active
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | AO 18-17 RESTRUCTURING OF THE RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE DIVISION - OKALOOSA COUNTY | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGE STONE, WILLIAM F: ASSIGNED | |
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF: ORDER CLOSING ACTION | |
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER CLOSING ACTION | |
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE FOR MAY 3 2017 VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT / DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE / DISCHARGE NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS AND RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2017013001 | |
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED | |
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: KOCH, HEATHER J; LENZI, EMILIO R SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2015 CA 004896 F, ROUNDPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING CORPORATION VS. BIENVENU, BARRY B ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: NOTICE REGARDING SUBMISSION OF ORDERS-3/28/2017 | |
March 24, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED | |
March 24, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR ROO | |
March 24, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE SCHEDULED FOR 5/3/17, VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT, DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DISCHARGE NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, AND RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS (PLF) | |
March 24, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE SCHEDULED FOR 5/3/17, VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT, DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DISCHARGE NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, AND RETURN ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS (PLF) | |
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE - Recorded (OR.3282.3772 / 3110854) | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER ON REPORT OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE | |
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event | COPY OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE | |
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | COURT RESULT: COURT EVENT DISPOSED | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event | REPORT OF MAGISTRATE AND NOTICE OF FILING | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: GILSON, ALI J SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2015 CA 004896 F, ROUNDPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING CORPORATION VS. BIENVENU, BARRY B ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: NFSL-11/17/2016 | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE - DENIED - NO FINAL JUDGMENT | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | PROPOSED CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | PROPOSED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | PROPOSED CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING: 11/03/16 @ 11:15AM | |
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING SET FOR 11/03/2016 AT 11:15 AM IN FWB/ , JDG: NIXON, THOMAS | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE FILED | |
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER FROM ATTY | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT (PLF) | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILED ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE FILED | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT (PLF) | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE & ORIGINAL MORTGAGE | |
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY BARRY BIENVENU | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | MANUAL RECORDING ANNOTATIONS LIS PENDENS LINE 6 | |
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED: BARRY B BIENVENU 01/25/16 | |
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2016001776 | |
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO: BARRY B BIENVENU - ISSUED BY CLERK 01/13/16 | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $1,905.00 RECEIPT #2015063137 | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | ||
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGE NIXON, THOMAS: ASSIGNED | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | CIVIL DOCKET SHEET FILED | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS NOT ISSUED TO: BARRY B BIENVENU | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE-PRETRIAL ORDER | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | CLERKS LETTER AS TO FEES DUE AND NON ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | LIS PENDENS RECORDING LETTER | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | LIS PENDENS | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | REAL PROPERTY/MTG FORECLOSURE >$250,000 ASSESSED $1905.00 | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 12/30/2015 CASE NUMBER 2015 CA 004896 F |