Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Batte, Heidi, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Batte, Bradley, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts with AHO, MARIANNE LLOYD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAHO, MARIANNE LLOYD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 08, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT: BRADLEY M BATTE | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Judge: AHO , MARIANNE L Assigned | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ADDRESS CHANGE | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $295.00 Receipt Number YX 224161 | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $295.00 | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND COUNTER PETITION | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER: TO COUNTER-PETITION | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.