Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Bell, Bethann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Steedley, Thomas Eugene Jr, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 46-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | DV AMENDED EXTENDED TEMPORARY INJUNCTION | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Event DV TEMP INJ scheduled on 4/10/2024 at 0830 AM, YX - Judge ERIC ROBERSON presiding. | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | DV EXTENDED TEMPORARY INJUNCTION | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: BETHANN BELL 10/11/23 | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: THOMAS STEEDLEY JR 10/11/23 | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Event DV TEMP INJ scheduled on 10/11/2023 at 0830 AM, YX - Judge ERIC ROBERSON presiding. | |
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: THOMAS STEEDLEY JR. 9/26/23 | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: ROBERSON , ERIC C assigned | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 452023DR000852DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/26/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.