Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Allen, Robin Anne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Allen, Richard Michael, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts with BASS, LESTER BERNARD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE: OF ENGAGING COURT REPORTER | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING: 03/13/24 @ 9AM | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION 02/27/23 @ 9:30AM | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE: AS MEDIATOR | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING: 01/18/2024 AT 2:00 PM VIA ZOOM - AMENDED | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE: FROM ATTY | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER REFERING PARTIES TO MEDIATION | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING: 01/18/24 @ 2PM | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUPPLMENTAL COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER: ON REMP HOLIDAY TIMESHARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.