Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Hinckley, Rachel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hinckley, Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts with DANIEL, JAMES HUNT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL SIGNED DELIVERED | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CIVIL CONTEMPT AND FOR ENFORCEMENT | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Reopened for DR REOPEN CONTEMPT/ENFORCEMENT on 11/29/2023 | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPENED | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER DOMESTICATING FOREIGN JUDGMENT- RECORD | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING 11/15/23 @ 1:45PM | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE: FROM ANDREW HINCKLEY | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION TO DOMESTICATE FOREIGN JUDGMENT/ ORDER | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | UCCJ AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.