Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Liberty Savings Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Lea, Morgan Brittany, against Florence Point Owners Assoc. I, In Possession 1, Unk Tenant, Nusraty, Hamed A, Nusraty, Nicole Dana, Possession 2, Unk Tenant In, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
|
This complaint is a verified complaint to foreclose a mortgage filed by Liberty Savings Bank, FSB against the defendants Nicole Nusraty, Hamed Nusraty, Florence Point Owners Association, and unknown tenants in possession. The complaint states that Ni...
MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: September 25, 2023CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY
Date: September 25, 2023COVER SHEET
Date: September 25, 2023VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: September 25, 2023DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: September 25, 2023EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED -NICOLE NUSRATY
Date: September 25, 2023NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: September 25, 2023EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED -UNK TENANT IN POSSESSION 1
Date: September 25, 2023EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED -HAMED A. NUSRATY
Date: September 25, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC- UNK TENANT IN POSSESION 1
Date: September 26, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC- FLORENCE POINT OWNERS ASSOC., INC.
Date: September 26, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK TENANT IN POSSESSION 2
Date: October 17, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK TENANT IN POSSESSION 1
Date: October 17, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC- UNK TENANT IN POSSESSION 2
Date: September 26, 2023NOTICE/ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 26, 2023EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED -FLORENCE POINT OWNERS ASSOC., INC.
Date: September 25, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: September 25, 2023NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
Date: September 25, 2023CERTIFICATE: OF NOTE POSSESSION
Date: September 25, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC- HAMED A. NUSRATY
Date: September 26, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: NICOLE NUSRATY 10/10/23
Date: October 17, 2023EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED -UNK TENANT IN POSSESSION 2
Date: September 25, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC-NICOLE NUSRATY
Date: September 26, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: FLORENCE POINT OWNERS ASSOC., INC. 10/10/23
Date: October 17, 2023CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL- RECORD
Date: November 07, 2023CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: October 16, 2023STANDING ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS
Date: September 26, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: HAMED A. NUSRATY 10/10/23
Date: October 17, 2023FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: November 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event CMC on 12/18/2023 0930 AM Judge ERIC ROBERSON results CANCELLED on 11/7/2023 | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL- RECORD | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK TENANT IN POSSESSION 2 | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: NICOLE NUSRATY 10/10/23 | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: FLORENCE POINT OWNERS ASSOC., INC. 10/10/23 | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: HAMED A. NUSRATY 10/10/23 | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.