Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Carrington Mortgage Services L, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Melanson, Kyle Robert, against Crews, Harold R, Strickland, Mark Allen, Unknown Spouse Of Harold R. Cr, Unknown Spouse Of Mark Allen S, Unknown Tenant 1, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
|
COVER SHEET
Date: September 13, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: September 13, 2023DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: September 13, 2023VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: September 13, 2023MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: September 13, 2023NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: September 13, 2023EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED UNKN SPOUSE OF HAROLD CREWS
Date: September 13, 2023EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED MARK ALLEN STRICKLAND
Date: September 13, 2023EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED HAROLD CREWS
Date: September 13, 2023UNKN SPOUSE OF MARK STRICKLAND
Date: September 14, 2023EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED UNKN SPOUSE OF MARK STRICKLAND
Date: September 13, 2023EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED UNKN TENANT 1
Date: September 13, 2023UNKN SPOUSE OF HAROLD CREWS
Date: September 14, 2023NOTICE OF FILING: PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: September 13, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC UNKN TENANT 1
Date: September 14, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC MARK ALLEN STRICKLAND
Date: September 14, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED/NOTICE OF CMC HAROLD CREWS
Date: September 14, 2023NOTICE/ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/20/23
Date: September 14, 2023ANSWER: MARK ALLEN STRICKLAND
Date: October 19, 2023STANDING ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS
Date: September 19, 2023NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY: UNK SPOUSE OF MARK ALLEN STRICKLAND & UNK TENANT #1
Date: October 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY -HAROLD R. CREWS
Date: October 24, 2023NOTICE OF ACTION: HAROLD R. CREWS & UNK SPOUSE OF HAROLD R. CREWS
Date: October 25, 2023NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED
Date: October 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY -UNK SOUSE OF HAROLD R. CREWS
Date: October 24, 2023CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: October 25, 2023VER. STATEMENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION UPON NATURAL PERSON
Date: October 25, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: HAROLD R. CREWS & UNK SPOUSE OF HAROLD R. CREWS
Date: October 25, 2023VER. STATEMENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION UPON UNK SPOUSE OF HAROLD R. CREWS
Date: October 25, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MARK ALLEN STRICKLAND 10/02/23
Date: October 25, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: HAROLD R. CREWS
Date: October 25, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK SPOUSE OF HAROLD R. CREWS
Date: October 25, 2023PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: November 15, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED
Date: December 08, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK SPOUSE OF MARK ALLEN STRICKLAND
Date: November 08, 2023CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: 2/20/24 930AM
Date: November 20, 2023MISCELLANEOUS: VERIFIED STATEMENT OF LACK OF KNOWLEDGE AS TO DEF'S MILITARY STATUS
Date: December 08, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK TENANT #1
Date: November 08, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE: ORDER OF CASE MGMT.
Date: November 20, 2023MISCELLANEOUS: VERIFIED STATEMENT AS TO MILITARY STATUS
Date: December 08, 2023DEFAULT: H. CREWS & UNKN SPOUSE OF H. CREWS
Date: December 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT: H. CREWS & UNKN SPOUSE OF H. CREWS | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS: VERIFIED STATEMENT OF LACK OF KNOWLEDGE AS TO DEF'S MILITARY STATUS | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS: VERIFIED STATEMENT AS TO MILITARY STATUS | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Event CMC scheduled on 2/20/2024 at 0930 AM, YX - Judge ERIC ROBERSON presiding. | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: 2/20/24 930AM | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE: ORDER OF CASE MGMT. | |
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK SPOUSE OF MARK ALLEN STRICKLAND | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: UNK TENANT #1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.