Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bray, David Earl, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Rinker, Rocky L., against Alcorn, Marjorie E, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by David Earl Bray II against Marjorie E. Alcorn for partition of real property located in Nassau County, Florida. The property in question is described as a portion of Lot 1, Block 3, Subdivision Plat of Lands of Estate of Je...
COMPLAINT
Date: September 11, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: MAJORIE ALCORN
Date: November 14, 2023NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: September 11, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: MARJORIE ALCORN
Date: November 14, 2023COVER SHEET
Date: September 11, 2023EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED -MARJORIE E. ALCORN
Date: September 11, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: MARJORIE ALCORN
Date: November 17, 2023STANDING ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS
Date: September 12, 2023NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED
Date: November 17, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED: MARJORIE E. ALCORN
Date: September 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY
Date: November 14, 2023NOTICE OF ACTION: MARJORIE ALCORN
Date: November 20, 2023PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: December 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION: MARJORIE ALCORN | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: MARJORIE ALCORN | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: MAJORIE ALCORN | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: MARJORIE ALCORN | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $4.00 | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $4.00 Receipt Number YX 220160 | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.