Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Goyette, Joshua, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Penland, Samuel Perry, against Geico General Insurance Compan, represented by Penland, Samuel Perry, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2017 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event | CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | EMAIL: FROM LINDA TO ASHLEY STRICKLAND | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST | |
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE: PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event | ANSWER: JOSHUA GOYETTE | |
August 09, 2017 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY RESPONSE | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE: AND REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.