Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Federal National Mortgage Asso, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rosaler, Brian Lee, against Florida Housing Finance Corpor, Funch, Deborah, Funch, Johnny, In Possession #1, Unknown Tena, North Hampton Association, Inc, (total of 6) See All represented by Goldsberry, Michael Jay, Sonderling, Eric Scott, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts with Steven M. Fahlgren presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven M. Fahlgren Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2016 |
CategoryHomestead Resid $250,000 More |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS | |
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE: 080917 ELISABETH PORTER | |
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
August 09, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: HEARING 091317 130PM | |
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION: TO DISMISS | |
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: 091317 130PM | |
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFAULT: JOHNNY FUNCH | |
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.