Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lvnv Funding, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brachfeld, Erica L, against Guadalupe Arteaga, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCollections - Consumer Credit (Crc 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions84 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time482 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR JUDGMENT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Not Applicable |
|
April 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
April 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION/NOTICE RE 1033 CCP FILED Not Applicable |
|
April 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES Not Applicable |
|
April 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF FILED RE: IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585(A) Not Applicable |
|
April 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF ERICA BRACHFELD FILED RE: CALCULATION OF INTEREST & WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES Not Applicable |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF ERICA BRACHFELD FILED RE: IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE DUE TO COURTS INTERNAL BACKLOG Not Applicable |
|
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF - Minutes OFF-CALENDAR |
|
March 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR CLERK/COURT JUDGMENT FILED Not Applicable |
|
March 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF/TO NAME & ADDRESS CHANGE FILED ON BEHALF OF LVNV FUNDING Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.