Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Deperrodil, Virginia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nowicki, Kristopher Matthew, against Ean Holdings, Llc, Enterprise Leasing Company Of, Koehler, Robert Eugene, represented by Reed, Ronald Ernst, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 16, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | EMAIL: BETSY RODRIGUEZ | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | EMAIL: TO: J.A. ASHLEY STRICKLAND FROM: BETSY RODRIGUEZ | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: MEDIATION | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION 040318 130PM | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION: | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.