Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Caraway, Michael, Kottler, Seth, filed a(n) Other Civil Other case against Bank Of America National Assoc, represented by Savani, Junaid, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2013 |
CategoryOther Civil Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event | CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event | CANCELLATION OF HEARING 030615 1030AM | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE:3615 @ 1030AM | |
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING: 030615 1030AM | |
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE | |
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS | |
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER:AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Judge: SOUD , ADRIAN G Assigned | |
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.