Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hd Supply Electrical Ltd, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Kobrin, Todd Fredrick, against Federal Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 16, 2012 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event | CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Payment received: $4.00 Receipt Number YX 6987 | |
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 Total Assessed $4.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 assessed at sum $4.00 | |
November 06, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED: FEDERAL INS CO | |
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Payment received: $4.00 Receipt Number YX 6249 | |
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $4.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $4.00 | |
October 16, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED: FEDERAL INS COMP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.