Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fleming, William, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Franco, Joseph Anthony, against Holland, Michael Larry, Holland, Debbie L, John Holland Contractors Inc, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2011 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event | CLOSING ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOSED DISMISSAL | |
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | NOT: DISMISSAL NON CLOSIN | |
October 28, 2011 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SUMMONS/RTD | |
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event | NOT: SERVING INTERROGATORIES | |
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event | REQ FOR PRODUCTION/TO PRODUCE | |
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event | NOT: NOTICE | |
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.