Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Makley, Robert, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Spohrer, Matthew Walden, against The Massengill Company, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 27, 2010 |
CategoryNegligence Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 10, 2013 | Docket Event | CLOSING ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOSED DISMISSAL | |
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL UNDELIVERED | |
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event | ORD: ORDER TO WITHDRAW | |
November 23, 2011 | Docket Event | FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO dismissed 11/23/2011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.