Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Smith, Bradley, Bresko, Laura, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Scholz, Richard J, against Mariners Walk Association Inc, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2010 |
CategoryOther Civil Libel/Slander |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event | NOT: OF CANCELLATION | |
July 29, 2011 | Docket Event | CLS: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
July 29, 2011 | Docket Event | SCANNED DOCUMENT CLOSED | |
July 11, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event | MTN: MOT CONTEMPT/ENFORCEMENT | |
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event | NOT: OF CANCELLATION | |
January 20, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.