Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lewis, Johnie E, filed a(n) Other Civil Other case represented by Fahlgren, Steven Michael, against The Housing Authority Of Ferna, Woody, Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2009 |
CategoryOther Civil Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event | CLS: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL REC | |
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event | SCANNED DOCUMENT CLOSED | |
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event | COPY FILED | |
April 12, 2012 | Docket Event | NOT: PROPOSED DISMISSAL CA/DR | |
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event | MOT: MOTION TO DISMISS | |
September 17, 2009 | Docket Event | ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE | |
September 16, 2009 | Docket Event | OPN:COMPLAINT/DECLARATORY JUDG | |
September 16, 2009 | Docket Event | SCANNED DOCUMENT OPEN | |
September 16, 2009 | Docket Event | ASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL NEW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.