Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bowen, David, Bowen, Patricia A, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Mccranie, Daniel Irvine, against City Of Fernandina Beach, represented by Dietzen, Leonard Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2008 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 25, 2009 | Docket Event | CLS: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
November 25, 2009 | Docket Event | SCANNED DOCUMENT CLOSED | |
November 25, 2009 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE/MEMO TO JUDGE | |
September 17, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event | REQ FOR PRODUCTION/TO PRODUCE | |
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event | NOT: OF SERVICE | |
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event | NOT: PRODUCTION NON-PARTY | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | NOT: OF SERVICE | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | NOT: OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.