Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tyler Plaza Llp, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Williamson, Gregory Allen, against Mosely, Jon, Mosely, Virginia, Isle Of Capri Furniture Inc, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE/MEMO FROM CLERK | |
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY | |
August 18, 2009 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE/MEMO TO JUDGE | |
July 08, 2009 | Docket Event | NON CLS: ORDER | |
July 08, 2009 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE/MEMO TO JUDGE | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL FINAL JUDGMENT | |
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
April 27, 2009 | Docket Event | MTN: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT | |
April 27, 2009 | Docket Event | AFF: SUPPORT MOTION JUDGMENT | |
April 27, 2009 | Docket Event | AFF: AFFIDAVIT ATTRY'S FEES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.