Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
State Of Florida filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Christopher Benjamin Pumo, represented by Carlos Fleites, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 03, 2022 |
CategoryUtc Infraction |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Traffic Court Disposition Letter | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING - TR - PRETRIAL - Hamilton, Sharon | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposition | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES * | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Setting Cause for Pretrial | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE * Comments: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, ENTRY OF GENERAL DENIAL, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY [E] | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED * | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED * |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.