Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Arnaldo A Boza Jr, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Adrian Stubbs, Anya Vasquez, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts County Civil Key West with Peary S Fowler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeary S Fowler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2022 |
CategoryEvictions Non-Monetary (Residential) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCounty Civil Key West |
Return Of Service 6167157 Comments: POSTED RESIDENTIAL 5 DAY
Date: August 03, 2022Notice Of Hearing 6176931 Comments: (jv)
Date: August 08, 2022Order * 6176927 Comments: Setting Mediation (jv) 8/16/2022@1p.m.
Date: August 08, 2022Letter * 6172930 Comments: from Dfnts
Date: August 05, 2022Complaint 6158685
Date: July 29, 2022Summons Issued 6158681
Date: July 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Minutes | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Mediated Settlement Agreement * | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING - CC - EVICTION HEARING - Fowler, Peary S | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Claim Amount at Disposition | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Order * Comments: Approving Mediation Agreement and Order of Administrative Dismissal (jv) | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Order * Comments: Report of Mediation (jv) | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Order * Comments: Setting Mediation (jv) 8/16/2022@1p.m. | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Of Hearing Comments: (jv) | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Of Hearing 6176931 Comments: (jv) | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Order * 6176927 Comments: Setting Mediation (jv) 8/16/2022@1p.m. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.