Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lisa Remus, filed a(n) General Antitrust - Antitrust case represented by Zachary Zermay, against Adam & Eve Stores, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil Key West with Mark H. Jones presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2022 |
CategoryAnti-Trust Trade Regulation |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaAntitrust |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Antitrust |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil Key West |
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: September 19, 2022Complaint
Date: September 19, 2022Designation of E-mail Address
Date: September 19, 2022Summons Submitted for Issuance Comments: Adam and Eve Stores
Date: September 19, 2022Signed Summons Comments: Adam and Eve Stores
Date: September 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING - CA - Status Conference - Garcia, Luis | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Claim Amount at Disposition | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Removal of US District Court Comments: Dfnt PHE Inc's Notice of Removal to US District Court for the Southern District of Florida | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING - CA - Hearing - Garcia, Luis | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion * Comments: to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings or in the Alternative Still for a More Definite Statement | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion For Extension Of Time Comments: PHE, INC.'s for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Class Action Complaint (e) | |
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Order * Comments: General Civil Case Management/Scheduling Order (jv) | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING - CA - Hearing - Garcia, Luis | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Order * Comments: Notice of Status Conference 8/4/23 @ 11:30 am (jv) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.