Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Monroe County, Florida, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Kelly Dugan, against James H Johnston, Janet A Johnston, represented by Ralph Deas, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Timothy Koenig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy Koenig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2022 |
CategoryOther Real Property Actions - $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion To Strike * Comments: Affirmative Defenses | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer And Affirmative Defenses Comments: to Amended Complaint | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Order * Comments: on Pltf's Mtn for Leave to File Amended Complaint (jv) | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Witness and Exhibit List Comments: Pltf Monroe County's Fact Witness and Exhibit List | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service on Order Served Comments: 9/14/22 - Janet A Johnston | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service on Order Served Comments: 9/14/22 - James H Johnston | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Of Appearance * | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer And Affirmative Defenses | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service on Summons Served Comments: 9/12/22 - James H Johnston |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.