Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
State Of Florida filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Evert Andres Guevara, represented by Ted L. Hollander & Associates, Pa, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Criminal Key West with Peary S Fowler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeary S Fowler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryUtc Infraction |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseCriminal Key West |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | COPY * Comments: envelope | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING - TR - PRETRIAL - Fowler, Peary S | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES * | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Traffic Court Disposition Letter Comments: F$150 CC$106 = 60 DTP | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Disposition | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Setting Cause for Pretrial | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE * | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED * |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.