Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
State Of Florida filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Pablo Perez, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Criminal Plantation Key with Sharon Hamilton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryUtc Infraction |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseCriminal Plantation Key |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING - TR - PRETRIAL | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES * | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Disposition | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Setting Cause for Pretrial | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED * | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Compliance | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED * Comments: DEF'S COPY | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | REQ FOR TRAF HEARING, NOT GUILTY PLEA | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | REQ FOR TRAF HEARING, NOT GUILTY PLEA 5731345 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED * 5730871 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.