Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
State Of Florida filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Maykel Cardenas Franco, represented by Ted Hollander, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Criminal Marathon with Mark Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2021 |
CategoryUtc Infraction |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseCriminal Marathon |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Traffic Court Disposition Letter | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | TRAFFIC COURT MINIUTES | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING - TR - PRETRIAL | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Disposition | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Setting Cause for Pretrial | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE * Comments: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED * |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.