Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Chiriac, Constantin, represented by Rios , Manuel Armando, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2017 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Traffic Trial
Judge: Vierra, Manuel |
|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Traffic Arraignment
Judge: Vierra, Manuel |
|
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Traffic Advisement of Rights, Plea of Not Guilty | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Letter Sent | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Subpoena | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Received | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Letter Sent | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Received | |
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.