Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Daniel Calabro, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Sean Hernandez, against Citizens Property Casualty Insurance Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil Key West with Timothy Koenig presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 20, 2018 |
CategoryTax Litigations |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil Key West |
Civil Cover Sheet 4497104 Comments: (E)
Date: November 20, 2018Request For Admissions 4497107 Comments: (E)
Date: November 20, 2018Notice Of Filing * 4497106 Comments: (E)
Date: November 20, 2018Complaint 4497105 Comments: (E)
Date: November 20, 2018Notice Of Service Of Interrogatories 4497108 Comments: (E)
Date: November 20, 2018Notice Of Service 4536542 Comments: of Scheduling Order (e)
Date: December 21, 2018Request To Produce 4497109 Comments: (E)
Date: November 20, 2018Summons to be Issued by Clerk 4497110 Comments: (E)
Date: November 20, 2018Notice * 4580714 Comments: of Service of Agreed Scheduling Order (e)
Date: January 28, 2019Designation of E-mail Address 4556567 Comments: (E)
Date: January 10, 2019Notice Of Appearance * 4556566 Comments: (E)
Date: January 10, 2019Request For Copies 4921976 Comments: (E)
Date: October 28, 2019Response to Request for Production 4655485 Comments: (E)
Date: March 28, 2019Motion For Extension Of Time 4744376 Comments: (E)
Date: June 07, 2019Notice of Cancellation of Deposition 4776905 Comments: (E)
Date: July 03, 2019Notice Of Service Of Interrogatories 4670311 Comments: (E)
Date: April 09, 2019Answer And Affirmative Defenses 4592019 Comments: (E)
Date: February 07, 2019Response to Request for Admissions 4655486 Comments: (E)
Date: March 28, 2019Certificate of Non-Objections * 4670887 Comments: (E)
Date: April 10, 2019Notice of Cancellation of Deposition 4801607 Comments: (E)
Date: July 24, 2019Motion For Extension Of Time 4710193 Comments: (E)
Date: May 09, 2019Notice of Serving Answers to Interrogatories 4655487 Comments: (E)
Date: March 28, 2019Notice Of Service 4655488 Comments: (E)
Date: March 28, 2019Request For Production * 4670310 Comments: (E)
Date: April 09, 2019Request For Admissions 4670309 Comments: (E)
Date: April 09, 2019Response to Request for Admissions 4744374 Comments: (E)
Date: June 07, 2019Notice of Production from Non-Party 4670755 Comments: (E)
Date: April 09, 2019Notice Of Taking Deposition * 4751946 Comments: (E)
Date: June 12, 2019Notice Of Taking Deposition * 4699392 Comments: (E)
Date: May 02, 2019Motion For Extension Of Time 4731790 Comments: (E)
Date: May 29, 2019Notice Of Taking Deposition * 4723414 Comments: (E)
Date: May 21, 2019Witness List Plaintiff 4906439 Comments: (E)
Date: October 16, 2019Notice * 4731850 Comments: Of Withdrawal (E)
Date: May 29, 2019Notice of Serving Answers to Interrogatories 4744373 Comments: (E)
Date: June 07, 2019Motion To Withdraw 4793525 Comments: (E)
Date: July 17, 2019Response to Request for Production 4744375 Comments: (E)
Date: June 07, 2019Notice Of Taking Deposition * 4751945 Comments: (E)
Date: June 12, 2019Amended Notice * 4766110 Comments: Of Taking Depo Duces Tecum (E)
Date: June 24, 2019Stipulation For Substitution Of Counsel * 4807408 Comments: (E)
Date: July 30, 2019Notice of Cancellation of Deposition 4801696 Comments: (E)
Date: July 24, 2019Witness List 4906402 Comments: (E)
Date: October 15, 2019Notice * 4841439 Comments: Of Charging Lien (E)
Date: August 22, 2019Notice Of Taking Deposition * 4885672 Comments: (E)
Date: September 30, 2019Exhibit List 4906403 Comments: (E)
Date: October 15, 2019Exhibit List Plaintiff 4906440 Comments: (E)
Date: October 16, 2019Notice Of Unavailability * 4920488 Comments: (E)
Date: October 25, 2019Notice of Production from Non-Party 5059031 Comments: (E)
Date: February 19, 2020Notice of Change of Address 4921975 Comments: (E)
Date: October 28, 2019Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena 4920729 Comments: (E)
Date: October 25, 2019Witness List Defendant 4944596 Comments: (E)
Date: November 14, 2019Motion To Show Cause 5095094 Comments: (E)
Date: March 23, 2020Certificate of Non-Objections * 4939513 Comments: (E)
Date: November 08, 2019Motion * 5106615 Comments: Dfnt's Mtn to Limit Judgment
Date: April 02, 2020Motion To Show Cause 5059030 Comments: (E)
Date: February 19, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Agreed Order * 5174524 Comments: Agreed Final Order of Dismissal with Prejudice | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Claim Amount at Disposition | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation * 5169724 Comments: of Settlement and Dismissal with Prejudice (e) | |
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion * 5106615 Comments: Dfnt's Mtn to Limit Judgment | |
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion To Show Cause 5095094 Comments: (E) | |
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Designation of E-mail Address 5074766 Comments: Amended For Service Of Court Documents (E) | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Waiver * 5059327 Comments: Of Objection To Production Of Docs From Non-Party And request For Copies (E) | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Production from Non-Party 5059031 Comments: (E) | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion To Show Cause 5059030 Comments: (E) | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Witness List Defendant 4944596 Comments: (E) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.