Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Janine Fulton-Duplessis, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Arthur Duplessis, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Family Key West with Bonnie J Helms presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseFamily Key West |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event | HEARING - DR - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Helms, Bonnie J | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference | |
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Report and Recommendation | |
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Completion Of Parenting Course | |
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Service of Court Reports for Family CMC | |
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Judgment Dissolution Of Marriage | |
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Standing Order for Case Management Conference | |
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Standing Temporary Domestic Relations Order | |
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer Waiver and Request for copy of FJDM | |
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Compliance With Mandatory Disclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.