Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Sugarloaf Wi-Fi Inc., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by John Marston, against James Olean, Kevin Gerard, Michael Bowden, Randall Livingston, Randolph Chapman, (total of 7) See All represented by Matthew Lavisky, Scott Damon, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil Key West with Mark Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2017 |
CategoryContract Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil Key West |
Amended Notice * 4028293 Comments: (E) of Taking Deposition of Non-Party Bob Adair
Date: October 12, 2017Response * 4542912 Comments: (E)
Date: December 31, 2018Complaint 3730488 Comments: (e)
Date: January 09, 2017Reply 4139129 Comments: [E]
Date: January 29, 2018Amended Complaint 3730722 Comments: (e)
Date: January 10, 2017Civil Cover Sheet 3730487 Comments: (e)
Date: January 09, 2017Notice Of Taking Deposition * 4153834 Comments: (e)
Date: February 10, 2018Motion * 3927008 Comments: E-PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 28, 2017Notice Of Hearing 3773510 Comments: (E) on Deft's Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 14, 2017Notice Of Unavailability * 3886593 Comments: E
Date: May 22, 2017Motion * 4028271 Comments: (E) for Continuance of Pltf's Motion for Partial summary Judgment
Date: October 11, 2017Notice Of Taking Deposition * 3975658 Comments: Bob Adair [e]
Date: August 07, 2017Request For Production * 4145223 Comments: {E}
Date: February 04, 2018Notice Of Hearing 3975287 Comments: 10.16.17 @ 9:00 am [e]
Date: August 04, 2017Motion * 3874053 Comments: to Add Monore County As Party (e)
Date: May 08, 2017Deposition Transcript 4116683 Comments: OF ROBERT R.ADAIR [E] 56-PGS/NOT PRINTED
Date: January 11, 2018Notice of Cancellation of Hearing 3956231 Comments: (E)
Date: July 20, 2017Notice Of Hearing 3931990 Comments: (E)
Date: July 03, 2017Notice Of Taking Deposition * 4157903 Comments: (e)
Date: February 12, 2018Response to Motion 3783471 Comments: e filed
Date: February 20, 2017Motion * 3941431 Comments: (E) to Amend Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 11, 2017Notice Of Unavailability * 3927000 Comments: E
Date: June 27, 2017Amended Notice of Hearing 3975598 Comments: 10.16.17 @ 1:30 pm [e]
Date: August 07, 2017Notice of Cancellation of Hearing 4028273 Comments: (E)
Date: October 11, 2017Motion to Amend Complaint 4466916 Comments: (E)
Date: October 29, 2018Motion * 4555709 Comments: (E)
Date: January 10, 2019Request * 4196445 Comments: Defendant's - for Judicial Notice (e)
Date: March 19, 2018Request For Admissions 4157974 Comments: Defendant's First (e)
Date: February 12, 2018Answer * 4175621 Comments: (E) to deft's Requests for Admissions
Date: March 01, 2018Amended Notice Of Taking Deposition * 4159981 Comments: Defendant's Second (e)
Date: February 14, 2018Motion to Amend Complaint 4492079 Comments: (E)
Date: November 16, 2018Notice of Cancellation of Hearing 4542455 Comments: (e)
Date: December 31, 2018Notice Of Unavailability * 4492173 Comments: (E)
Date: November 16, 2018Notice Of Hearing 4507327
Date: November 29, 2018Notice of Cancellation of Deposition 4176433 Comments: (E)
Date: March 02, 2018Amended Notice Of Taking Deposition * 4157927 Comments: Defendant's (e)
Date: February 12, 2018Notice Of Appearance * 4170441 Comments: (E) Co-Counsel Pltf
Date: February 23, 2018Notice Of Unavailability * 4541236 Comments: (E)
Date: December 28, 2018Motion for continuance 4368929 Comments: (E)
Date: August 06, 2018Notice Of Unavailability * 4492170 Comments: (E)
Date: November 16, 2018Notice of Cancellation of Deposition 4176426 Comments: (E)
Date: March 02, 2018Motion to Amend Complaint 4902519 Comments: (E)
Date: October 09, 2019Notice Of Hearing 4949645 Comments: AMENDED --- (E)
Date: November 19, 2019Notice Of Appearance * 4949634 Comments: (E)
Date: November 18, 2019Notice Of Hearing 4948524 Comments: (E)
Date: November 18, 2019Second Amended Complaint 4980401 Comments: (E)
Date: December 13, 2019Notice Of Appearance * 5007453 Comments: (E)
Date: January 10, 2020Return Of Service 5105408 Comments: Non-Served on Robert Adair (E)
Date: April 02, 2020Return Of Service 5026206 Comments: (E)
Date: January 25, 2020Return Of Service 5026201 Comments: (E)
Date: January 25, 2020Motion To Compel 5083592 Comments: Plntff's Ex Parte --- (E)
Date: March 12, 2020Return Of Service 5026197 Comments: (E)
Date: January 25, 2020Request For Production * 4984875 Comments: (E)
Date: December 18, 2019Return of Service Unserved 5008921 Comments: (E)
Date: January 11, 2020Notice Of Hearing 5084839 Comments: (E)
Date: March 13, 2020Notice Of Action 5110588 Comments: (E)
Date: April 08, 2020Affidavit of Diligent Search 5110031 Comments: Robert Adair
Date: April 07, 2020Response to Motion 5195839 Comments: To Dismiss (E)
Date: June 08, 2020Notice Of Hearing 5179900 Comments: 6/11/20 @ 1:30 p.m. (e)
Date: May 21, 2020Notice Of Hearing 5177689 Comments: June 1, 2020 @ 9:30 p.m. (e)
Date: May 19, 2020Response to Motion 5195355 Comments: Pltf's Response to Dfnts Mtn to Dismiss
Date: June 08, 2020Notice Of Cancellation 5179899 Comments: of Hearing 6/1/20 @ 9:30 a.m. (e)
Date: May 21, 2020Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal * 5303966 Comments: of Count(s) I and II Only
Date: August 29, 2020Notice of Cancellation of Hearing 5345333 Comments: 10/5/20 @ 11:00 am
Date: October 02, 2020Notice Of Mediation Conference 5551127 Comments: 4/27/21 @ 10:00 am
Date: April 01, 2021Motion To Compel 5445196 Comments: Mediation (E)
Date: December 30, 2020Notice Of Mediation Conference 5604416 Comments: 6/8/21 @ 10:00 am
Date: May 17, 2021Notice Of Hearing 5313262 Comments: Via Zoom
Date: September 07, 2020Notice Of Mediation Conference 5640401 Comments: 7/6/21 @ 10:00 am
Date: June 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Order * Comments: Granting Lee Robert Rohe's Consent Mtn to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Dfnts Sugarloaf Key Volunteer Fire Dept. Kevin Gerard, et. al. (jv) | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion To Withdraw Comments: as Atty of Record obo Dft Sugarloaf Key Volunteer Fire Dept | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion * Comments: Joint Motion to Abate | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion To Dismiss * Comments: Dfts' Supplement to Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint (Not Printed - 40 Pgs) | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion To Dismiss * 5983742 Comments: Dfts' Supplement to Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint (Not Printed - 40 Pgs) | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Order * Comments: for Civil Case Management/Scheduling Plan | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Order * 5809550 Comments: for Civil Case Management/Scheduling Plan | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Mediation Report 5705776 | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Mediation Report Comments: Agreed to Pause and Continue on 7/6/21 @ 10:00 am |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.