Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Key West Police Dept, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Ronald Ramsingh, against Paul Mastraccio, Forfeiture Of One Thousand One Hundred Twenty-Three Dollars Us Currency ($1,123., in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil Key West with Tegan Slaton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryForfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil Key West |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Final Order 2478641 Comments: of dismissal | |
November 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Final Judgment 2249088 Comments: of Forfriture on Default | |
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion * 2247845 Comments: Verified - for Entry of Order of Final Default Judgment (e) | |
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Military/Non-Military Affidavit 2247847 Comments: (e) | |
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Corrected * 2154715 Comments: Order Detemining Probable Cause (Correcting Year From 2012 to 2013) | |
March 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Order * 1969854 Comments: determining probable cause | |
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event | HEARING - CA - Hearing - Slaton, Tegan | |
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Court Minutes 1963854 | |
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice Of Hearing | |
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event | HEARING - CA - Hearing - Slaton, Tegan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.