Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Michael W Lyne Ii, filed a(n) Petition For Writ Of Certiorari case represented by Halford Schuhmacher, against Florida Dept Of Highway Safety And Motor Vehicles, represented by Damaris Reynolds, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil Key West with David J Audlin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryPetition For Writ Of Certiorari |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil Key West |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Denying * 2269633 Comments: Certiorari | |
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Court Minutes 2227815 | |
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion * 2218563 Comments: Agreed Motion to Continue Oral Argument blank order attached sent to judge Audlin's office on 10/8/2013 | |
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion * 2217425 Comments: Agreed Motion to Continue Oral Argument blank order attached sent to judge Audlin's office on 10/8/2013 | |
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event | HEARING - CA - Order to Show Cause - Audlin, David J | |
August 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Response * 2170415 Comments: TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI (E) | |
August 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice * 2170414 Comments: OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES (E) | |
August 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Other 2170416 Comments: RESPONDENT'S APPENDIX TO RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI (E) | |
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Order * 2162939 Comments: To Show Cause | |
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Granting * 1926558 Comments: stip for sub of counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.