Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
U S Bank National Association As Trustee For Jpmorgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sankar Balram, against American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc As Successor In Interest To Option One Mort, Duane N Kahn, Small Business Administration, Susan T Kahn, Unknown Parties In Possession #1, (total of 6) See All represented by Martin Hoffman, Sabrina Daly, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil Key West with Mark Jones presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryForeclosure - 250,000 Or More (Circuit Civil) - Do Not Use |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil Key West |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Title/Proposed 3373912 | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Foreclosure Sale Bid Sheet 3362209 | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Sale 3362212 | |
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof Of Publication * 3354510 | |
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof Of Publication * 3354511 | |
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | HEARING - CA - Foreclosure Sales - Jones, Mark | |
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice Of Foreclosure Sale 3301358 | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Order * 3292715 Comments: on Pltf's Motion to Reschedule Foreclosure Sale | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Reclose Case | |
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Reopen Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.