Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Andrew Kanter, against Unknown Person In Possession, Michael Lee Maigrat Sr, Kimerlie A Grizzle Maigrat, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil Key West with David J Audlin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryForeclosure - 250,000 Or More (Circuit Civil) - Do Not Use |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil Key West |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal * 1380190 Comments: and release of lis pendens | |
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form 1385342 | |
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Agreed Order * 1229785 Comments: of sub of counsel | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Stipulation For Substitution Of Counsel * 1221025 Comments: pltfs | |
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Order Of Referral 1205678 Comments: to special magistrate | |
October 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Order Granting * 918695 Comments: stip to sub counsel | |
October 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Order Granting * 903177 Comments: stip to sub counsel | |
October 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Stipulation For Substitution Of Counsel * 905196 | |
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Order Granting * 653246 Comments: Ex Parte Mtn to Set Aside Default | |
March 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Ex-parte Motion * 648970 Comments: to set aside default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.