Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
New Vision Yacht Charters Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Shawn Mckamey, against All Keys Diesel Repair Inc, Detriot Diesel Remanufacturing Corp, Florida Detriot Diesel-Allison Inc, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Cirucit Civil Marathon with Ruth Becker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryContract Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCirucit Civil Marathon |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal * 2191788 Comments: with prejudice | |
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal * 2189762 Comments: with prejudice [e] | |
August 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Order * 2143877 Comments: from 3rd DCA on voluntary dismissal of appeal | |
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Receipt Returned * 2078628 Comments: 3rd DCA | |
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Acknowledgement Of New Case From Third District Court Of App 2079707 Comments: #3D13-1489 | |
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate Of Mailing * 2075988 Comments: notice of appeal to 3rd dca | |
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice Of Appeal 2069051 | |
May 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Denying * 2042957 Comments: motion for reconsideration and rehearing | |
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice Of Unavailability * 2033580 Comments: Shawn McKamey [e] | |
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Response * 2029663 Comments: /opposition to motion for reconsideration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.