Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hsbc Bank Usa National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Steven Greenfield, against Mary Jo Donnelly, Peter Donnelly, Mary Ann Collins, David C Collins, represented by Christopher Nelson, Richard Malafy, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Cirucit Civil Marathon with Ruth Becker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Circuit Civil) - Do Not Use |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCirucit Civil Marathon |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Title/Proposed 2098981 | |
June 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Sale 2086412 | |
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event | HEARING - CA - Foreclosure Sales - Becker, Ruth | |
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Foreclosure Sale Bid Sheet 2086408 | |
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof Of Publication * 2076804 | |
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof Of Publication * 2076803 | |
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Denying * 2068921 Comments: defendants' motion to postpone foreclosure sale, or in the alternative, motion for extended move out date | |
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Reclose Case | |
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event | HEARING - CA - Open Motion Hearing - Becker, Ruth | |
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Court Minutes 2068938 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.