Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Aurora Loan Services Llc, Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jeffrey Trinz, Unknown Delisser, Connie, against Administrator Of The Small Business Administration, Courtney Saucier, Steven Aka Steven F Prine Prine, Unknown Spouse Of Courtney Saucier, Unknown Spouse Of Steven Prine Aka Steven F Prine, (total of 6) See All represented by Timothy Treanor, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil Key West with Bonnie J Helms presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryForeclosure (Circuit Civil) - Do Not Use |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil Key West |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Other 5137442 Comments: entire file scanned 4/23/2020 | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Directing Clerk to Close Case 4098002 Comments: BK;2884 PG; 535 | |
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Title/Proposed 3313222 | |
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Foreclosure Sale Bid Sheet 3299224 | |
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event | HEARING - CA - Foreclosure Sales - Jones, Mark | |
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Sale 3299264 | |
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof Of Publication * 3297799 | |
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof Of Publication * 3297798 | |
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Costs 3298478 Comments: E | |
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event | HEARING - CA - Civil Non Jury Trial/circut - Jones, Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.