Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Susan Vander Sterre, filed a(n) Other - Matters Not Falling Within The Other Civil Subcatego case represented by Urban Patterson, against Dirk Martin Vander Sterre, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil Plantation Key with Luis Garcia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 20, 2006 |
CategoryOther - Matters Not Falling Within The Other Civil Subcatego |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil Plantation Key |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Notes * Comments: BOX 276 | |
February 05, 2007 | Docket Event | - Comments: NEW MARATHON CASE # 07-CA-43-M | |
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event | - Comments: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / WILLIAM DEVANE, ESQ. | |
February 01, 2007 | Docket Event | - Comments: FILE SENT TO MARATHON PER TRANSFER ORDER *** | |
January 30, 2007 | Docket Event | - Comments: ORDER ON GRANTING STIPULATION TO TRANSFER CASE TO MIDDLE KEYS OR:2270 / PG:1650 | |
January 30, 2007 | Docket Event | - Comments: DISPOSED FOR OTHER REASONS / TRANSFER TO MARATHON | |
January 24, 2007 | Docket Event | - Comments: Summons Returned Served DIRK VANDER STERRE | |
January 24, 2007 | Docket Event | - Comments: STIPULATION TO TRANSFER CASE FOR PROPER VENUE | |
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event | - Comments: MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT IX OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, DEFENDANT'S | |
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event | - Comments: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, BY DEFENDANT'S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.