Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Atlantico At Kendall, Atlantic Villas At Kendall, Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Ryan R Mccain, against Gongora, Duniel, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with SD 03 - South Dade 03 - Judge De La Rosa, Lissette presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 18, 2024 |
CategoryEvictions - Residential |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | 5 Day Summons Issued | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint Mailed Parties: Gongora Duniel |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
5 Day Summons Issued Parties: Gongora Duniel |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:2360021 AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/23/2024 REGISTER#:236 CASHIER:FERGUS |
|
April 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3120228 AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:RYAN R MCCAIN BARFIELD MCCAIN AYOUB, P.A. 4460 MEDICAL CENTER WA WEST PALM BEACH FL 33407 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE 1 $185.00 $185.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$185.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/20/2024 REGISTER#:312 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.