Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Gonzalez Real Estate Holdings, Llc., filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Silverman, Gerald, against Cherranfant, Ivlise, Chertranfant, Celyon, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with CL 01 - Caleb 01 - Judge Murray, Gordon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 18, 2024 |
CategoryEvictions - Non-Residential |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is an action for the removal of tenants from a commercial property in Miami-Dade County, Florida. The Plaintiff, GONZALEZ REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC., is the Landlord, and the Defendants, CELYON CHERRANFANT and IVLISE CHERRANFANT, are t...
Complaint
Date: April 18, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3200020 AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:SILVERMAN, GERALD 25 W FLAGLER ST STE 900 MIAMI FL 33130-1720 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE 1 $300.00 $300.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/20/2024 REGISTER#:320 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:2680002 AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK TENDER AMT:$20.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/19/2024 REGISTER#:268 CASHIER:E401833 |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:2680003 AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK TENDER AMT:$20.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/19/2024 REGISTER#:268 CASHIER:E401833 |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.