Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Hester, Alexis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Drazen, Daniel, against Frater, Charles, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with CA21 - Downtown Miami - Judge Miller, David C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2024 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint involves a motor vehicle accident that occurred on April 30, 2023, at the intersection of SW 104th Avenue and SW 184th Street in Miami-Dade County, Florida. The Plaintiff, who was operating a 2022 Honda, was involved in a collision wit...
Complaint
Date: April 19, 2024Request for Admissions
Date: April 19, 2024Request for Production
Date: April 19, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Electronic Summons Email Notification Sent DANIEL DRAZEN |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: Frater Charles |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3140256 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:DRAZEN, DANIEL THE INJURY FIRM 1608 E COMMERCIAL BLVD FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33334 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/24/2024 REGISTER#:314 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | 20 Day Summons Issued | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3170155 AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:DRAZEN, DANIEL THE INJURY FIRM 1608 E COMMERCIAL BLVD FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33334 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE 1 $401.00 $401.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/23/2024 REGISTER#:317 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.