Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Sanchez, Roberto, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against La Gorce Country Club, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with CA05 - Downtown Miami - Judge Del Rio, Vivianne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2024 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is an action for specific performance. The Plaintiff, a resident of Miami-Dade County, Florida, is a Founder Member of the Defendant Club, a not-for-profit corporation operating the La Gorce Country Club in Miami-Beach, Florida. The Cl...
Complaint
Date: April 19, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | 20 Day Summons Issued | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: La Gorce Country Club |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3140357 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:LAMB, ADAM J 2 SOUTH BISCAYNE BLVD STE 2750 MIAMI FL 33130 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/24/2024 REGISTER#:314 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Electronic Summons Email Notification Sent ADAM J LAMB |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3170058 AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:LAMB, ADAM J 2 SOUTH BISCAYNE BLVD STE 2750 MIAMI FL 33130 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE 1 $401.00 $401.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/23/2024 REGISTER#:317 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.