Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Delgado, Andres, Sifonte, Naicer, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Torgnielli, Adriana Alejandra, Torgnielli, Juan Ricardo, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with CA31 - Downtown Miami - Judge Sanchez-Llorens, Migna presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2024 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint involves Plaintiffs Andres Delgado and Naicer Sifonte filing a Complaint against Defendants Adriana Alejandra Torgnielli and Juan Ricardo Torgnielli. The incident occurred on October 23, 2023, when Delgado was driving a 2014 Ford F150 ...
Complaint
Date: April 19, 2024Request for Production
Date: April 19, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3140033 AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:GONZALEZ, JESUS R. 6405 NW 36 ST STE 210-A MIAMI FL 33166 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$20.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/24/2024 REGISTER#:314 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3170033 AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:GONZALEZ, JESUS R. 6405 NW 36 ST STE 210-A MIAMI FL 33166 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE 1 $401.00 $401.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/23/2024 REGISTER#:317 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: Torgnielli Juan Ricardo |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | 20 Day Summons Issued | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: Torgnielli Adriana Alejandra |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Electronic Summons Email Notification Sent JESUS R. GONZALEZ GONZALEZ |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.