Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Connell, Patrick M, against Espana, Maria C, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with CA15 - Downtown Miami - Judge Rodriguez, Jose M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 18, 2024 |
CategoryRpmf -Non-Homestead |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | 20 Day Summons Issued | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: ESPANA MARIA C |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Electronic Summons Email Notification Sent JOHN ANTHONY VAN NESS |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3170166 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:VAN NESS, JOHN ANTHONY, ESQ 1239 E NEWPORT CENTER DR STE 110 DEERFIELD BEACH FL 33442-7711 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/23/2024 REGISTER#:317 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
April 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3150132 AMT PAID:$1,915.00 NAME:VAN NESS, JOHN ANTHONY, ESQ 1239 E NEWPORT CENTER DR STE 110 DEERFIELD BEACH FL 33442-7711 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING 1 $1,906.00 $1,906.00 3142-RECORDING FEE 1 $4.00 $4.00 3142-RECORDING FEE 1 $5.00 $5.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$1,915.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/20/2024 REGISTER#:315 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Lis Pendens | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Possession of Note |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.