Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Park Square 5 Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Alvarez, Adrian Jorge, against Tcc City Place Llc, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with CA10 - Downtown Miami - Judge Lopez, Peter R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 16, 2024 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
The document is a legal complaint filed in the Circuit Court of the 11th Judicial Circuit in Miami-Dade County, Florida. The plaintiff, Park Square 5, LLC, is suing the defendant, TCC City Place, LLC, for breach of lease and seeking damages in excess...
Complaint
Date: April 16, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3150097 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:ALVAREZ, ADRIAN JORGE 225 NE MIZNER BLVD., SUITE 510 BOCA RATON FL 33432-4083 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/20/2024 REGISTER#:315 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3100111 AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:ALVAREZ, ADRIAN JORGE 225 NE MIZNER BLVD., SUITE 510 BOCA RATON FL 33432-4083 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE 1 $401.00 $401.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/18/2024 REGISTER#:310 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.