Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Santa Maria On Brickell Condominium Assoc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ferrer, Kristen E, Esq, against Gv Love, Llc, Perez-Abreu, Esq., Javier, Perez-Abreu & Martin-Lavielle, P.A., in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with CA21 - Downtown Miami - Judge Miller, David C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 15, 2024 |
CategoryRpmf -Non-Homestead |
Last RefreshedApril 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint involves GV LOVE, LLC, a Florida limited liability company, as the record owner of a condominium unit. The complaint states that GV LOVE has failed to pay assessments levied by the ASSOCIATION against the Subject Property, totaling ove...
Complaint
Date: April 15, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3150188 AMT PAID:$50.00 NAME:FERRER, KRISTEN E, ESQ 1 DATRAN CTR STE 400 MIAMI FL 33156-7814 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$50.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/20/2024 REGISTER#:315 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3180145 AMT PAID:$9.00 NAME:FERRER, KRISTEN E, ESQ 1 DATRAN CTR STE 400 MIAMI FL 33156-7814 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3142-RECORDING FEE 1 $4.00 $4.00 3142-RECORDING FEE 1 $5.00 $5.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$9.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/19/2024 REGISTER#:318 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Lis Pendens | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3240280 AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:FERRER, KRISTEN E, ESQ 1 DATRAN CTR STE 400 MIAMI FL 33156-7814 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING 1 $401.00 $401.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/16/2024 REGISTER#:324 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.